CA SB1482 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 90000 of, and to add Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 90020) to Division 24 of, the Financial Code, relating to financing.
Title
Commercial financing.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1482 Glazer et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1482 Glazer et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4072.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3985.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3727.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 90000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 90020 | New Code | See Bill Text |