CA SB151 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17537.3, 22951, 22952, 22956, 22958, and 22963 of, and to add Section 22964 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 308 of the Penal Code, relating to tobacco.
Title
Tobacco products: minimum legal age.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB151 Hernandez (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1148.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | April 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 544.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | March 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17537.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22952 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22958 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22963 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22964 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |