CA SB152 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11108 of, and to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 1600) to Division 1 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Assembly - SB 152 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Assembly - SB 152 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING Amend By SEYARTO Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By REYES (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB152 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB152 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Assembly - SB 152 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING Amend By SEYARTO Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By REYES (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB152 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB152 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 8:45 p.m. | |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1660.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 19. Page 2120.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Amendments by Assembly Member Seyarto tabled on motion by Assembly Member Reyes. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 2119.) |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2118.) |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 285.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 11108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 1600 | New Code | See Bill Text |