CA SB1521 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1799.302 of the Civil Code, relating to finance.
Title
Commercial financing transactions: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1521 B. & F.I. (Limón) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1521 B. & F.I. (Limón) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3728.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 11. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1799.302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |