CA SB164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1209.5 of the Penal Code, relating to infractions.
Title
Infractions: community service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB164 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 164 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB164 McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 164 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB164 McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2054.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 562.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 440.) (March 26). |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1209.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |