CA SB168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71358 of, and to add Section 71353 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Climate change: Chief Climate Resilience Officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - 05/16/19 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 Wieckowski et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - 05/16/19 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 Wieckowski et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 9). |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 383.) (March 20). |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71353 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71358 | Amended Code | Citation Text |