CA SB172 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6151 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 12306.6 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
In-home supportive services: sales tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12306.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_172&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_172_bill_20130205_introduced.html |