CA SB180 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25544 to the Public Resources Code, and to amend the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 8340) of Division 4.1 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 8340 and 8341 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: emissions of greenhouse gases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 857.) (April 29). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 508.) (April 7). |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and E., U., & C. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25544 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8340 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8341 | New Code | See Bill Text |