CA SB184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 621, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 621, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27301 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Social security number truncation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB184 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 184 Morrell Senate Third Reading By MELENDEZ (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB184 Morrell Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 184 Morrell Senate Third Reading By MELENDEZ (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB184 Morrell Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 621, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2840.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and L. GOV. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 642.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 539.) (March 28). |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |