CA SB184 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15432, 15451.5, 100800, 100820, and 100825 of, and to add Section 12534 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 120475, 120511, 122440, 127691, 127692, 127694, 127695, 127696, 128205, 128210, 128230, and 128235 of, to amend and repeal Section 104395 of, to add Sections 1385.035, 11831.1, 11834.28, 11839.6.1, 124024, and 124110.5 to, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 101320) to Chapter 3 of Part 3 of Division 101 of, to add Article 2.3 (commencing with Section 123451) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 106 of, to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 127500) to Part 2 of Division 107 of, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 128250) to Chapter 4 of Part 3 of Division 107 of, and to repeal Sections 128215, 128220, and 128225 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend, repeal, and add Section 12693.74 of, and to add Section 10181.35 to, the Insurance Code, to add Part 4.6 (commencing with Section 1490) to Division 2 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 1001.36, 1026, 1026.2, 1369, 1370, 1370.6, 1372, 1602, 1603, 1604, 2603, and 4019 of, and to repeal Section 1369.1 of, the Penal Code, to amend Sections 18914 and 18916 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 4335.2, 4361, 5328, 5848.5, 5961.5, 7276, 7279, 7281, 7290, 14005.22, 14005.26, 14005.37, 14005.64, 14007.8, 14007.9, 14011.10, 14011.66, 14011.7, 14087.46, 14105.075, 14105.192, 14105.48, 14124.12, 14132.100, 14132.88, 14132.98, 14138.1, 14138.12, 14138.13, 14138.14, 14138.15, 14138.16, 14138.17, 14138.23, 14148, 14148.8, 14170.8, 14184.201, 14184.206, 14184.400, 14184.405, 14184.405, 14184.800, 14186.3, 14197, 14197.04, 14197.2, 15826, 15854, and 16501.3 of, to amend the heading of Article 4.1 (commencing with Section 14138.1) of Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 14005.12, 14005.13, 14105.2, 15832, and 15840 of, to add Sections 4336, 4361.7, 5325.3, 14005.255, 14105.197, 14132.57, 15849, and 15854.5 to, to add Chapter 16.5 (commencing with Section 18998) to Part 6 of Division 9 of, to add and repeal Section 4360.5 of, to repeal Sections 7284, 7285, 7286, 7287, 7291, 7292, 14005.225, 14138.11, and 14138.19 of, and to repeal and add Sections 14132.725, 14132.731, 14138.10, 14138.18, 14138.21, and 14138.22 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 184 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB184 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB184 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB184 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB184 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4542.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 5615.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 5550.) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rules suspended. |
2022-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 296.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |