CA SB195 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66290 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Equity in Higher Education Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-28 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-19 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2009-05-11 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 701.) | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 495.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-09 | To Coms. on ED. and JUD. | |
2009-02-24 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |