CA SB233 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1162 of, and to repeal and add Section 782.1 of, the Evidence Code, and to add Section 647.3 to the Penal Code, relating to crime.
Title
Immunity from arrest.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB233 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 233 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Kamlager-Dove (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB233 Wiener et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 233 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Kamlager-Dove (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB233 Wiener et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1990.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 2493.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 922.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 623.) (April 9). |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | April 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 782.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 647.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |