CA SB267 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 479, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 479, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 60852.2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil assessment.
Title
Pupil assessment: high school exit examination: eligible pupils with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB267 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 267 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Education (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB267 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB267 Pavley Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB267 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 267 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Education (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB267 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB267 Pavley Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB267 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 479, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4948.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4923.) |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4868.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 6404.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6). |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5544.) . |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1200.) Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1202.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1202.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1010.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 694.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and ED. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 12289 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26245 | New Code | See Bill Text |