CA SB267 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 503, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 503, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12817 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driver’s licenses.
Title
Driver’s licenses: United States Foreign Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB267 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 267 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Fong (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB267 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 267 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Fong (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB267 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 503, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2956.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 804.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |