CA SB270 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.3 (commencing with Section 42280) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Solid waste: single-use carryout bags.
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB270 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - SB 270 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - SB 270 Padilla Motion to Reconsider (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 270 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 38 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB270 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - SB 270 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - SB 270 Padilla Motion to Reconsider (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 270 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 38 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB270 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Set for hearing August 29. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 5014.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 4998.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4939.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6635.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 6636.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider continued to August 28. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 33. Page 6428.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bonta. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6283.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 14). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 14). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 2.) |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 712.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 486.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 106.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42280 | New Code | See Bill Text |