CA SB289 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1265.8 and 130060 of, and to add Sections 1265.9, 130064, 130065.1, and 130066 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Hospitals: seismic safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB289 Ducheny (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-27 - Assembly - SB 289 Ducheny Senate Third Reading By FLETCHER (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB289 Ducheny (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-27 - Assembly - SB 289 Ducheny Senate Third Reading By FLETCHER (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB289 Ducheny (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-27 | To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2010-09-03 | Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57. | |
2010-08-30 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5005.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-27 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 3. Page 6799.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 25.) | |
2010-08-25 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6624.) | |
2010-08-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-08-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-08-16 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6256.) To third reading. Re-referred to Com. On HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-09 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2010-08-05 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2009-09-11 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-05-21 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-11 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-11 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 828.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-06 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-28 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 556.) | |
2009-03-24 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-25 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |