CA SB289 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23152 and 23153 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: driving under the influence: drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |