CA SB30 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state property, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State property.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Denham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-04-23 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2008-12-03 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 2. | |
2008-12-02 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_30&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20081202_introduced.html |