CA SB30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 11.5 (commencing with Section 25970) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Building decarbonization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25970 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB30 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB30#99INT |