CA SB303 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2352.5, 2540, 2591, 2591.5, 2640, and 2641 of, and to add Section 2541.5 to, the Probate Code, relating to guardians and conservators.
Title
Guardians and conservators: compensation: residence of conservatee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB303 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 303 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Obernolte (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB303 Wieckowski (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 303 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Obernolte (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB303 Wieckowski (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2457.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2667.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1027.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 30). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 2352.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2541.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 2591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2591.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2641 | Amended Code | Citation Text |