CA SB312 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 33009.7 to the Education Code, and to add Section 15491 to the Government Code, relating to public meetings and hearings.
Title
Public meetings and hearings.
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Alquist [D] | Sen. Jeff Denham [R] | Sen. Dean Florez [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Sen. Gloria Romero [D] | Sen. George Runner [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Senate - Special Consent #18 SB312 Romero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - SB 312 Romero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB312 Romero (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - SB 312 Romero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB312 Romero (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |
2009-09-02 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2130.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-31 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-27 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2763.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |
2009-05-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-21 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-06 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 798.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 656.) | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 496.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |