CA SB312 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 111792.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to cosmetics.
Title
Cosmetic Fragrance and Flavor Ingredient Right to Know Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB312 Leyva Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 312 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB312 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 312 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB312 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 4397.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5198.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | June 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and V.A. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111792.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |