CA SB340 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 17600) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to advertising.
Title
Advertising: automatic renewal and continuous service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #17 SB340 Yee (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Assembly - SB 340 Yee Senate Third Reading By TORLAKSON (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - Assembly - SB 340 Yee Senate Third Reading By TORLAKSON (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB340 Yee (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Assembly - SB 340 Yee Senate Third Reading By TORLAKSON (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-13 - Assembly - SB 340 Yee Senate Third Reading By TORLAKSON (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB340 Yee (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-04 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2009-08-31 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2022.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-26 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2710.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2674.) To third reading. (Corrected August 25.) | |
2009-07-24 | Action rescinded whereby bill read third time, passed, and to Senate. | |
2009-07-16 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-07-16 | From Special Consent Calendar. To unfinished business. Ordered returned to Assembly for further action. | |
2009-07-15 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-13 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-07-13 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2487.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-08 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-07-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-07-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-23 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-05-28 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 623.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-22 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 497.) | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-26 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |