CA SB340 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2704.096 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
High-speed rail bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-10-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | April 9 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 8. Page 655.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and GOV. & F. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2704.096 | New Code | See Bill Text |