CA SB343 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-12 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-12 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 381.3 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Energy: efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 De León (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 De León (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 27). | |
2011-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-06-20 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 1268.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1115.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 857.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25744.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25747 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 381.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 382 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 385.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |