CA SB344 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 867, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 867, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 103885 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to cancer.
Title
Ken Maddy California Cancer Registry.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB344 Rubio Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 344 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB344 Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 344 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB344 Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 867, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2746.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3317.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1298.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1166.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 18). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 575.) (March 29). |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |