CA SB362 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 96.7 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: unpaid wages and benefits: internet website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB362 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1097.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 654.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 96.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |