CA SB366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66302.5 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: mandatory orientation for students.
Sponsors
Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB366 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - SB 366 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB366 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - SB 366 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB366 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2054.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2459.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 823.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66302.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |