CA SB376 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21090.2 to, and to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 25250) to Division 15 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: State Energy Resources Conservation and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB376 SIMITIAN (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB376 SIMITIAN (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 28.) | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on June 14.) | |
2010-06-10 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-01-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-01-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2730.) To Assembly. | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2693.) | |
2010-01-20 | Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 583.) | |
2009-04-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |