CA SB391 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3041 of, and to add Section 3041.8 to, the Penal Code, relating to parole, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Inmates: parole hearings.
Sponsors
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Asm. Alyson Huber [D] |
Sen. Doug La Malfa [R] | Asm. Dan Logue [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2012-01-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-12-15 | Set for hearing January 10. | |
2011-08-23 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3041.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 4000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |