CA SB391 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 27388.1 to the Government Code, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 50470) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Homes and Jobs Act of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB391 DeSaulnier Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB391 DeSaulnier Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. & E. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1166.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1013.) (May 23). |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 660.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 487.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27388.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50470 | New Code | See Bill Text |