CA SB391 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 241 and 243 of the Penal Code, relating to assault and battery.
Title
Assault and battery: transit employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | April 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 241.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 243 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 243.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |