CA SB397 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8571, 8627, 8627.5, 8634, and 8655 of, and to add Article 18.5 (commencing with Section 8663) to Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 120130, 120135, 120140, 120145, and 131080 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency powers.
Title
Emergency powers: essential services: religious services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-14-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | April 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 775.) Reconsideration granted. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referral to Com. on Health rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD., G.O., and HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8571 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8627.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8634 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8663 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 131080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |