CA SB400 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 54238.9 of the Government Code, relating to highways.
Title
Highways: surplus residential property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB400 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 400 Portantino Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB400 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 400 Portantino Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB400 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2991.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2941.) |
2017-09-13 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2814.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3217.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 25). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54238.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 101.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 101.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 1800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |