CA SB400 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 832.7 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: confidentiality of records.
Sponsors
Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB400 Wahab Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Assembly - SB 400 Wahab Senate Third Reading By Ortega (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB400 Wahab Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Assembly - SB 400 Wahab Senate Third Reading By Ortega (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB400 Wahab (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Assembly - SB 400 Wahab Senate Third Reading By Ortega (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB400 Wahab Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Assembly - SB 400 Wahab Senate Third Reading By Ortega (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB400 Wahab (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-02-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-02-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3200.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4039.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2024-01-12 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ortega. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan. |
2023-09-13 | Action rescinded whereby bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. | |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-09-11 | Action rescinded whereby Assembly amendments were concurred in, and the bill ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2469.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2955.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1080.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 659.) (April 11). |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 832.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |