CA SB423 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3610 and 3611 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 3610) of Division 4.5 of Title 1 of, to repeal Section 3616 of, and to repeal and add Sections 3612, 3613, 3614, and 3615 of, the Government Code, relating to public transportation employees.
Title
Public transportation employees: strikes: prohibition.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Steve Knight [R] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Connie Conway [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 2590.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing January 13. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 2432.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3612 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3613 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3614 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3616 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3616.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |