CA SB423 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 778, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 778, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65913.4 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: streamlined housing approvals: multifamily housing developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB423 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 423 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB423 Wiener et al (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 423 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB423 Wiener et al (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 778, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 2605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 3063.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 1401.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1170.) (May 18). |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 938.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 452.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |