CA SB424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 8780) to Chapter 4 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to environmental education.
Title
The California Regional Environmental Education Community Network.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB424 Allen (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1326.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 782.) (April 19). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8780 | New Code | See Bill Text |