CA SB426 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13185 to the Water Code, relating to water quality.
Title
Municipal separate storm sewer systems: financial capability analysis.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Rubio. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13185 | New Code | See Bill Text |