CA SB434 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 99178 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transit operators: street harassment survey.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. David Alvarez [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB434 Min et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 434 Min Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB434 Min et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 434 Min Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB434 Min et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2675.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3158.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for second hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1299.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1170.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 580.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99178 | New Code | See Bill Text |