CA SB44 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6217 of, and to add and repeal Section 6212 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to state lands.
Title
State lands: coastal hazard and legacy oil and gas well removal and remediation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 44 Jackson Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB44 Jackson et al (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB44 Jackson et al (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3040.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1317.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1176.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 783.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 363.) (March 14). |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |