CA SB456 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 26.7 (commencing with Section 79700) to the Water Code, relating to financing a water supply reliability and water source protection program, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Safe, Clean, Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2010.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-03-12 | To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_456&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_456_bill_20090226_introduced.html |