CA SB456 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 398.4 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Disclosure of sources of electrical generation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB456 Padilla (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2654.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2629.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1341.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 398.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |