CA SB456 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 422.3 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal threats.
Title
Criminal threats: discharge of a firearm.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB456 Block (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 456 Block Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB456 Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 456 Block Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB456 Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2015-09-08 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2015-09-08 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2015-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2206.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2528.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1021.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 595.) (April 14). |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 422.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 422.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |