CA SB457 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4155 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Bobcat Protection Act of 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | April 14 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 4155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |