CA SB457 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17053.92 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income taxes: credit: reduction in vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 457 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB457 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB457 Portantino et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB457 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB457 Portantino et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5389.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1232.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1192.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 843.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.92 | New Code | See Bill Text |