CA SB457 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6922 of, and to add Section 6904 to, the Family Code, relating to minors.
Title
Vision care: consent by a minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-17 - Assembly - SB 457 Menjivar Senate Third Reading By Papan (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB457 Menjivar et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB457 Menjivar et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-08-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-08-17 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2737.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 849.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 577.) (March 28). |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6904 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 6922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |