CA SB487 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 123467.5 of, and to add Section 1375.61 to, the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10133.641 to the Insurance Code, and to amend Sections 14043.6 and 14123 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to abortion.
Title
Abortion: provider protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB487 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 487 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 64 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB487 Atkins et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 487 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 64 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB487 Atkins et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2601.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 15. Page 3009.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1261.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1172.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 831.) (April 19). |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 577.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123467.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1375.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.641 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14043.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |