CA SB50 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23152 and 23153 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: driving under the influence: controlled
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-11 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB50 Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB50 Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-06-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-06-11 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-23 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-21 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-05-12 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 541.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15. | |
2010-12-15 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 86203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 87200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |