CA SB500 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54694 of, and to add Sections 54691.5 and 54697.5 to, the Education Code, relating to partnership academies.
Title
Partnership academies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 Hancock (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 Hancock (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-22 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 1118.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 850.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 54690 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 54691.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 54694 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 54697.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |